Search results
2 days ago · Tung Chee Hwa is the eldest son of shipping magnate Tung Chao Yung, who founded what became one of Hong Kong's largest shipping companies. After running Orient Overseas for 14...
3 days ago · 董建華 ,大紫荊勳賢 (英語: Tung Chee-Hwa [註 1] ,1937年7月7日 [註 2] — ),中华人民共和国政治人物,原副国级 领导人,香港特別行政區第1及第2屆行政長官(1997年7月1日—2005年3月12日,於第2屆任期期間辭職)。
Sep 10, 2024 · 董建華, 大紫荊勳賢 (英語: Tung Chee-Hwa[註 1],1937年7月7日 [註 2]—), 中華人民共和國 政治人物,原 副國級 領導人, 香港特別行政區 第1及第2屆 行政長官 (1997年7月1日—2005年3月12日,於第2屆任期期間辭職)。 他卸任行政長官後,其後董建華曾連續擔任第10至第13屆 全國政協副主席 至2023年止。 董建華於1992年經 香港總督 彭定康 任命為 行政局 非官守成員,1996年12月11日在 推選委員會 中擊敗 楊鐵樑 、 吳光正 和 李福善 等中勝出,獲時任 國務院總理 李鵬 任命為香港首任行政長官。
Sep 25, 2024 · The organisation was founded by Hong Kong’s first chief executive, Tung Chee-hwa in 2014, when the occupy civil disobedience movement was first beginning to form.
1 day ago · Notably absent from the event was former Chief Executive Tung Chee-hwa, marking his fourth consecutive absence. However, other former leaders including Leung Chun-ying, Carrie Lam, and Sir Donald Tsang, as well as various representatives from the central government and judicial branches, were present.
19 hours ago · This marks the fourth consecutive National Day flag-raising ceremony missed by Hong Kong's first chief executive, Tung Chee-hwa, who is recuperating at home. Several principal officials also ...
5 days ago · Chen Shuang, who resigned as CEO of China Everbright Limited in 2019, is being investigated for “suspected violations of the law”, the CCDI announced in a one-line statement on Tuesday.