Search results
Cruz Teng (born 18 September 1979) is a former Singaporean radio and television host. He is currently a communications professional. He made his radio debut in 1996 at the age of 16 and hosted radio and television programmes, as well as entertainment, trade and corporate events from 1996 to 2015.
Experienced storyteller. <br>Boardroom novice. <br>Radio geek. · Experience: Standard Chartered Bank · Location: Singapore · 500+ connections on LinkedIn. View Cruz Teng’s profile on...
- Standard Chartered Bank
Oct 29, 2022 · Also on the board of directors are Lynda Wee, Jed Tay, Soh Gim Teik and Cruz Teng. NoonTalk manages artistes such as Xu Bin and Kimberly Chia.
Cruz Teng Director, Communications — Standard Chartered | Board Director — NoonTalk Media 3mo Edited
Nov 10, 2015 · SINGAPORE — Cruz Teng has left MediaCorp Radio with effect from Nov 6, the former YES 933 head and producer-presenter confirmed in a statement on his website. Teng will join Noon Talk Media, an...
Accredited Director • Mr Cruz Teng • Singapore Institute of Directors credentials.sid.org.sg
23K Followers, 492 Following, 5,642 Posts - @cruzteng on Instagram: "".
Cruz Teng (born 18 September 1979) is a former Singaporean radio and television host. He is currently a communications professional.
Feb 6, 2014 · Cruz Teng is a DJ for a Mandarin Singapore radio station, YES 93.3FM. He attained the Assistant Programme Director post in May 2013 after he succeeded in clinching numerous awards as a DJ, including the 'Most Popular DJ' award.
Cruz Teng is Board Member at Noontalk Media Ltd. See Cruz Teng's compensation, career history, education, & memberships.